Global Patent Index - EP 1068434 A1

EP 1068434 A1 2001-01-17 - DIAGNOSIS OF AIR CONTAINMENT FOR AIR-CONTAINED INJECTION VALVES

Title (en)

DIAGNOSIS OF AIR CONTAINMENT FOR AIR-CONTAINED INJECTION VALVES

Title (de)

DIAGNOSE DER LUFTUMFASSUNG BEI LUFTUMFASSTEN EINSPRITZVENTILEN

Title (fr)

DIAGNOSTIC DE L'ENVELOPPE D'AIR DANS LE CAS DE SOUPAPES D'INJECTION A ENVELOPPE D'AIR

Publication

EP 1068434 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99967897 A

Priority

  • DE 9904082 W
  • DE 19860535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860535A1] The invention relates to a method for diagnosing the air containment of air-contained injection valves of an Otto engine with an induction pipe pressure sensor. According to said method, the air containment of the air-contained injection valves is switched off or on when the engine is hot, in overrun and the change in the induction pipe pressure resulting from the change in the air supply to the induction pipe is determined and compared with a threshold value. A value which does not exceed the threshold value is considered a defect.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 7/02; F02M 69/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/08 (2006.01); F02D 7/02 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/08 (2013.01); F02D 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040846A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860535 A1 20000706; EP 1068434 A1 20010117; EP 1068434 B1 20040421; JP 2002534632 A 20021015; WO 0040846 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909243 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE