Global Patent Index - EP 1068436 A1

EP 1068436 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR EQUALISING THE CYLINDERS OF A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR EQUALISING THE CYLINDERS OF A DIRECT INJECTION INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ZYLINDERGLEICHSTELLUNG BEI EINER MIT DIREKTEINSPRITZUNG ARBEITENDEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MISE AU MEME NIVEAU DES CYLINDRES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A INJECTION DIRECTE

Publication

EP 1068436 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913112 A

Priority

  • DE 9900654 W
  • DE 19814155 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814155A1] The r.p.m. values of the crankshaft are corrected by means of an acausal mean value filter. Modification of the kinetic energy of the crankshaft in the expansion interval of a cylinder is calculated on the basis of the dynamically corrected r.p.m. values and applied to the maximum amount of fuel which can be supplied during this interval. The non-uniform residue thus obtained indicates whether too much or too little fuel has been injected for the cylinder in question. The calculated residues are used to derive the correction terms for the injection times of the individual cylinders. This enables an entire range of characteristics to be adapted, especially with respect to changing speeds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950547A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814155 A1 19991014; EP 1068436 A1 20010117; EP 1068436 B1 20020213; US 6302083 B1 20011016; WO 9950547 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-05-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900863 20020321

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB