Global Patent Index - EP 1068439 A1

EP 1068439 A1 2001-01-17 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1068439 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962098 A

Priority

  • DE 9903783 W
  • DE 19900033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19900033A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection device for internal combustion engines in which the fuel injection valve member is controlled by control of the pressure in a control chamber (25). The control chamber is either relieved by a 2-3 relay control valve (28) or connected to a high-pressure fuel source (14). The control valve (28) is configured such that it comprises a valve body (35) which on either side has a valve sealing surface (37, 42) which both cooperate with a first (38) and a second (41) valve seat and control the high-pressure inflow into or outflow out of the control chamber (25). To influence the dynamics of the control processes the valve body has a throttle gap (47) upstream of its second valve sealing surface (42) and a collar (49) downstream of its first valve sealing surface (37). Between said collar (49) and the throttle gap (47) a pressure-fluid channel (26) starts which leads to the control chamber (25) whose inflow and outflow are thus influenced by the said collar and throttle gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0033 (2013.01); F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040854A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19900033 A1 20000706; EP 1068439 A1 20010117; JP 2002534637 A 20021015; US 6390066 B1 20020521; WO 0040854 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030613

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE