Global Patent Index - EP 1068445 A1

EP 1068445 A1 2001-01-17 - FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION DEVICE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1068445 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964367 A

Priority

  • DE 9903721 W
  • DE 19860678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860678A1] Disclosed is a fuel injection device for internal combustion engines. Said device supplies fuel from a high pressure fuel source (1) to fuel injection valves (9) controlled by a control device (10). The fuel injection device has an injection valve member (12) that is impinged upon by the supplied high pressure fuel via an exposed annular area (14) and that can be opened for effecting injection. The fuel is supplied by means of a pressure line (10a, 10b). The passage of fuel is controlled by a control valve (20) whose control valve is movable in a valve chamber (24) between two valve seats (30, 31) and which controls the connection between the high pressure fuel source (1) and the fuel injection valve (9) for effecting a preinjection and a main injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/00; F02M 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 61/10 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 63/004 (2013.01); F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 63/0068 (2013.01); F02M 2200/703 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039451A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860678 A1 20000706; EP 1068445 A1 20010117; EP 1068445 B1 20040331; JP 2002533613 A 20021008; US 6422211 B1 20020723; WO 0039451 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-01-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041124

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041124

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909039

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE