Global Patent Index - EP 1068448 A1

EP 1068448 A1 2001-01-17 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR HIGH-PRESSURE FUEL SUPPLY

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR HIGH-PRESSURE FUEL SUPPLY

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE ZUR KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX POUR L'ALIMENTATION HAUTE PRESSION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1068448 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907314 A

Priority

  • DE 9900344 W
  • DE 19814506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814506A1] The invention relates to a radial piston pump for high-pressure fuel supply in internal combustion engine fuel injection systems, especially common-rail injection systems. A disk (14) is placed on each radially arranged piston in a respective cylinder chamber. In relation to the above-mentioned invention it was noted that traditionally used disks (14) often became damaged, especially in the centre, during operation. The aim of the invention is thus to avoid damage to said disks. This is achieved by designing the centre of the disk (14) in such a way that the strain arising therein during operation is reduced. By reducing the strain on the centre of the disk (25,26) it is possible to extend the operational life of said disk (14) in an advantageous manner. The disk (14) functions in an impeccable manner even at high pressures of up to 2,000 bars.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01); F04B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950555A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814506 A1 19991014; EP 1068448 A1 20010117; EP 1068448 B1 20030730; JP 2002510015 A 20020402; JP 4288000 B2 20090701; US 6350107 B1 20020226; WO 9950555 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110209

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110209

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110209

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906437

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT