Global Patent Index - EP 1068450 A1

EP 1068450 A1 2001-01-17 - ADJUSTABLE FACE PLATE FOR HYDRAULIC PUMP OR MOTOR

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE FACE PLATE FOR HYDRAULIC PUMP OR MOTOR

Title (de)

EINSTELLBARE SPIEGELPLATTE FÜR EINE HYDRAULISCHE PUMPE ODER MOTOR

Title (fr)

PLAQUE AVANT REGLABLE POUR POMPE OU MOTEUR HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1068450 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99913745 A

Priority

  • NL 9900198 W
  • NL 1009607 A
  • US 5627198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951881A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic axial piston pump, motor or pressure transformer with a plurality of fluid chambers in the rotating cylinder block (6). The volume of the fluid chambers (7) changes between a minimum value (discharge) and a maximum value (suction) during each rotor (6) cycle. The rotatable face plate (8) can be adjusted by means of a transmission to an adjusting shaft (9) whereby the effective stroke volume is changed. Suction and discharge ports (14) are located in the rotatable face plate (8) thereby allowing controlled overlap of discharge openings to reduce energy losses due to high pressure fluid discharged at high speed through small openings, which improves efficiency of the pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20; F04B 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/24 (2006.01); F03C 1/253 (2006.01); F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 1/30 (2006.01); F04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2042 (2013.01); F04B 1/303 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951881A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951881 A1 19991014; DE 69911386 D1 20031023; DE 69911386 T2 20040701; EP 1068450 A1 20010117; EP 1068450 B1 20030917; JP 2002510773 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070406

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070406

2006-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911386 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020628

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL