Global Patent Index - EP 1068454 A1

EP 1068454 A1 2001-01-17 - SCREW ROTOR COMPRESSOR HAVING A MOVABLE WALL PORTION

Title (en)

SCREW ROTOR COMPRESSOR HAVING A MOVABLE WALL PORTION

Title (de)

SCHRAUBENKOMPRESSOR MIT EINEM BEWEGLICHEN WANDTEIL

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR A ROTOR A VIS A PARTIE DE PAROI MOBILE

Publication

EP 1068454 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909441 A

Priority

  • SE 9900305 W
  • SE 9801137 A
  • SE 9801778 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950560A1] The present invention relates to a screw rotor compressor that includes two mutually coacting helical screw rotors and a rotor housing (1). The housing (1) includes a first end wall (2) and a second end wall (3) and a barrel wall (7, 11) that interconnects the end walls. The housing (1) has internally the shape of two mutually intersecting cylinders and the first end wall (2) includes an inlet opening (19). The barrel wall (7, 11) includes an outlet opening (6) adjacent the second end wall (3), and also includes a further opening (9), this further opening extending from the outlet opening (6) towards the first end wall (2) and widening over both cylinder surfaces. The housing (1) also includes a movable or displaceable part (11) which coacts with the opening (9) and which engages the housing in a first position such as to form the mutually intersecting cylindrical surfaces, and which is out of engagement with said housing in a second position and therewith distanced from said further opening. The compressor also includes a maneuvering device for placing the movable part (11) selectively in its first or its second position. The maneuvering device is adapted to actuate a rotatable shaft (12) which is either mounted on the compressor or firmly fixed relative thereto and which is connected to said movable part (11) through the medium of a connecting element (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16; F04C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F04C 28/00 (2006.01); F04C 28/06 (2006.01); F04C 28/14 (2006.01); F04C 28/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 28/16 (2013.01); F04C 28/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950560A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950560 A1 19991007; DE 69917442 D1 20040624; DE 69917442 T2 20050525; DK 1068454 T3 20040809; EP 1068454 A1 20010117; EP 1068454 B1 20040519; JP 2002510017 A 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LYSHOLM TECHNOLOGIES A.B.

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060303

2006-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060303

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-12-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LYSHOLM TECHNOLOGIES A.B.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917442 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB IT

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENGLUND, ARNOLD

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FI FR GB IT