Global patent index - EP 1068478 A1

EP 1068478 A1 2001-01-17 - INTEGRATED COLLECTOR-HEAT TRANSFER UNIT

Title (en)

INTEGRATED COLLECTOR-HEAT TRANSFER UNIT

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE SAMMLER-WÄRMEÜBERTRAGER-BAUEINHEIT

Title (fr)

UNITE COLLECTEUR-ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR INTEGREE

Publication

EP 1068478 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99966865 A

Priority

  • DE 9903989 W
  • DE 19903833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19903833A1] The invention relates to an integrated collector-heat transfer unit, comprising a collector housing (1) in which a collector chamber (2) and a heat transfer unit having two separate heat transfer channels (5, 6) are located, said channels being disposed in thermal contact with one another, wherein one of the heat transfer channels (5) is part of a first flow channel extending from an inlet to an outlet in the housing of the collector and has a helical extension while the other heat transfer channel (6) is part of a second flow channel extending in-between the collector chamber and a connection of the housing. According to the invention, the second heat transfer channel (6) also has a helical extension, wherein the spirals thereof are in thermal contact with at least one adjacent spiral of the first heat transfer channel (5). Said unit can be used, for instance, in air conditioning systems for automobiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 43/00; B60H 1/32; F28D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 40/00 (2006.01); F25B 43/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/06 (2006.01); F28D 7/02 (2006.01); F28D 7/10 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/00342 (2013.01); F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F25B 43/006 (2013.01); F28D 7/022 (2013.01); F28D 7/024 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01); F25B 2400/051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046558A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903833 A1 20000803; AU 2277200 A 20000825; CA 2326558 A1 20000810; EP 1068478 A1 20010117; FR 2789159 A1 20000804; FR 2789159 B1 20060203; JP 2000227289 A 20000815; JP 4107461 B2 20080625; US 6298687 B1 20011009; WO 0046558 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040601

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030124

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE