Global Patent Index - EP 1068481 A1

EP 1068481 A1 2001-01-17 - HEAT EXCHANGING DEVICE WITH ACTIVE TWO-PHASE FLUID AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGING DEVICE WITH ACTIVE TWO-PHASE FLUID AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

ZWEIPHASIGE WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ECHANGES THERMIQUES A FLUIDE BIPHASIQUE ACTIF ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1068481 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910447 A

Priority

  • FR 9900722 W
  • FR 9803902 A
  • FR 9814462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776764A1] The invention concerns a heat exchange device (50) with active two-phase fluid, comprising at least a capillary pumping channel (9) and at least a gas transfer channel (6), said device enabling reversible fluid passage, between at least a capillary channel (9) and at least a gas transfer channel (6), during the liquid/gas or gas/liquid transition, resulting from temperature variations sustained by at least one zone of the device (50). It comprises at least one foil (2, 3, 4) comprising on one of its two main surfaces, at least two parallel slots, communicating longitudinally with each other and at least one foil (3, 4) capable of covering the grooves to form at least a capillary channel (9) and at least one gas transfer channel (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 15/02; F28D 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/02 (2006.01); F28D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 15/04 (2013.01); F28D 15/0233 (2013.01); F28D 15/0241 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950607A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776764 A1 19991001; FR 2776764 B1 20000630; DE 69910996 D1 20031009; DE 69910996 T2 20040722; EP 1068481 A1 20010117; EP 1068481 B1 20030903; WO 9950607 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080329

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080329

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910996 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB