Global Patent Index - EP 1068484 A1

EP 1068484 A1 2001-01-17 - SAFETY SYSTEM FOR A PROJECTILE FUSE

Title (en)

SAFETY SYSTEM FOR A PROJECTILE FUSE

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GESCHOSSZÜNDER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR AMORCE DE PROJECTILE

Publication

EP 1068484 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914666 A

Priority

  • GB 9901042 W
  • GB 9807290 A
  • GB 9817471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951934A1] The invention provides a safety system for a small arms projectile in which an initiating device is impacted by a firing member in order to detonate a main explosive charge. The system requires the firing member to be retained in a safe position in relation to the initiating device by at least two independent mechanisms. The firing member is initially supported in a forward position, in which it assists in holding the initiator device in a safe condition, and is caused to move rearwardly, through inertia, when the projectile is fired, destroying one of the retaining mechanisms and allowing the initiator device to adopt a primed position in which it can be activated by the firing member which at this time is retained by the other retaining mechanism which is automatically released when the projectile is in flight. The initiator device may, when held in its safe condition, be skewed with respect to the main explosive charge and may incorporate or support a shield disposed, in the safe condition, between the initiator device and the main explosive charge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 15/24; F42C 15/192; F42C 15/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 15/192 (2006.01); F42C 15/24 (2006.01); F42C 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 15/192 (2013.01); F42C 15/24 (2013.01); F42C 15/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951934A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951934 A1 19991014; AT 268000 T 20040615; AU 3339599 A 19991025; BR 9909431 A 20010911; CA 2326432 A1 19991014; CA 2326432 C 20071211; DE 69917621 D1 20040701; EP 1068484 A1 20010117; EP 1068484 B1 20040526; ES 2222698 T3 20050201; HK 1030257 A1 20050311; IL 138823 A 20070617; IL 138823 D0 20011125; MX PA00009711 A 20020424

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130407

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130406

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130406

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130406

2013-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SPECIAL CARTRIDGE CY LTD

- Effective date: 20130430

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041026

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-04-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2005-03-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-11 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1030257

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222698 T3

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-08-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917621 P 20040701

2004-06-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE