Global Patent Index - EP 1068560 A1

EP 1068560 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR PRINTING INDIVIDUAL SHEETS IN GROUPS USING THE DUPLEX METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRINTING INDIVIDUAL SHEETS IN GROUPS USING THE DUPLEX METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON EINZELBLÄTTERN IN GRUPPEN NACH DEM DUPLEXVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'IMPRESSION GROUPEE DE FEUILLES INDIVIDUELLES SELON LE PROCEDE DUPLEX

Publication

EP 1068560 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917943 A

Priority

  • DE 19814384 A
  • DE 19836746 A
  • EP 9902232 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950715A1] The invention relates to a method for printing individual sheets which are gathered into a group and fed past the print units (D1, D2) in groups. The result is a duplex operation with triple or quadruple printing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 85/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/238 (2013.01); G03G 15/0194 (2013.01); G03G 2215/00021 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0103 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950715A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950715 A1 19991007; DE 59913765 D1 20060921; EP 1068560 A1 20010117; EP 1068560 B1 20020410; EP 1174772 A2 20020123; EP 1174772 A3 20021204; EP 1174772 B1 20060809; JP 2002510068 A 20020402; JP 4456757 B2 20100428; US 2002081120 A1 20020627; US 6259884 B1 20010710; US 6647239 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901193

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130331

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901193 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB