Global Patent Index - EP 1068564 A1

EP 1068564 A1 2001-01-17 - INTEGRATED FIRE AND FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC ENGINE TORQUE LIMITING

Title (en)

INTEGRATED FIRE AND FLIGHT CONTROL SYSTEM WITH AUTOMATIC ENGINE TORQUE LIMITING

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTES FEUER- UND FLUGSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM MIT AUTOMATISCHER MOTORDREHMOMENTBESCHRÄNKUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE TIR ET DE VOL INTEGRE AVEC LIMITATION AUTOMATIQUE DU COUPLE DU MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1068564 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914890 A

Priority

  • US 9905020 W
  • US 5262898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950729A1] An integrated fire and flight control (IFFC) system (10) senses the actual engine torque (126) of a rotary wing aircraft in successive real time intervals and compares the sensed interval values with one or more reference maximum torque limits (144) for each of one or more prescribed maximum time intervals and, in the presence of an above limit actual torque for an above limit prescribed time interval, the IFFC automatically reduces the collective axis command (54).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 7/00 (2006.01); B64C 27/04 (2006.01); G05D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05D 1/0858 (2013.01); B64C 27/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950729A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950729 A1 19991007; CA 2321586 A1 19991007; DE 69900471 D1 20011220; DE 69900471 T2 20020822; EP 1068564 A1 20010117; EP 1068564 B1 20011114; JP 2002509844 A 20020402; US 6012676 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69900471

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110309

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050309

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900471

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-20

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT