Global Patent Index - EP 1068587 A1

EP 1068587 A1 2001-01-17 - COLOR SCANHEAD AND CURRENCY HANDLING SYSTEM EMPLOYING THE SAME

Title (en)

COLOR SCANHEAD AND CURRENCY HANDLING SYSTEM EMPLOYING THE SAME

Title (de)

FARBABTASTKOPF UND GELDVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINEM SOLCHEN FARBABTASTKOPF

Title (fr)

TETE D'EXPLORATION DE COULEURS ET SYSTEME DE MANIPULATION DE DEVISES METTANT EN OEUVRE CETTE TETE

Publication

EP 1068587 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912608 A

Priority

  • US 9905799 W
  • US 7822898 P
  • US 19725098 A
  • US 26817599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948042A1] A document handling system (10) is configured for processing a variety of different documents. The system includes an input receptacle (36) for receiving a stack of documents, a standard sensor (70) for scanning at least one non-color characteristic of the documents in the stack, a color sensor (300) for scanning the color characteristics of the documents, and an output receptacle (117) for receiving the documents after they have been processed. A transport mechanism (123, 141) is included for transporting the documents, one at a time, from the input receptacle (36) past the sensors (70, 300) to the output receptacle (117). An operator interface is provided for displaying information to an operator and inputting information into the system. A processor is also included for processing the data gathered from the sensors (70, 300) to evaluate the documents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01); G07D 7/16 (2006.01); G07D 7/20 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/04 (2006.01); H04N 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/20 (2013.01); G07D 7/1205 (2017.05); G07D 7/162 (2013.01); G07D 11/0084 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948042 A1 19990923; AU 3095099 A 19991011; CA 2322821 A1 19990923; CA 2322821 C 20060103; EP 1068587 A1 20010117; EP 1068587 A4 20020213; JP 2002507798 A 20020312; US 6256407 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070612

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040316

2002-02-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020102

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06K 9/20 A, 7G 07D 7/12 B, 7G 07D 7/16 B, 7G 07D 7/20 B

2001-05-30 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT