Global Patent Index - EP 1068589 A1

EP 1068589 A1 2001-01-17 - METHOD FOR LOADING DATA ONTO CHIP CARDS AND DEVICES ADAPTED THERETO

Title (en)

METHOD FOR LOADING DATA ONTO CHIP CARDS AND DEVICES ADAPTED THERETO

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN VON DATEN AUF CHIPKARTEN UND ENTSPRECHEND ANGEPASSTE VORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR CHARGER DES DONNEES SUR DES CARTES A PUCE ET DISPOSITIFS ADAPTES EN CONSEQUENCE

Publication

EP 1068589 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908732 A

Priority

  • CH 9900131 W
  • CH 78998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952066A1] A method for loading data onto chip cards (2), whereby data is transferred from a service centre (6) to an SIM card (1) and stored, using a mobile network (4). The SIM card (1) is inserted into a mobile device (3) and connected to said device by means of an interface fitted with contacts. The data stored by the SIM card (1) is transferred in a contact-free manner to a chip card (2) fitted with contacts. The mobile device (3) can, for example, be a mobile radio telephone and the mobile network (4) can be a GSM or UMTS network. Transfers are preferably secured and authenticated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/07; G07F 7/08; G07F 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/07 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/1008 (2013.01); G06Q 20/32 (2013.01); G06Q 20/3229 (2013.01); G06Q 20/327 (2013.01); G06Q 20/341 (2013.01); G06Q 20/353 (2013.01); G07F 7/0886 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952066 A1 19991014; AT 208931 T 20011115; AU 2824499 A 19991025; BR 9909330 A 20001212; CN 100440253 C 20081203; CN 1296592 A 20010523; DE 59900439 D1 20011220; DK 1068589 T3 20020225; EP 1068589 A1 20010117; EP 1068589 B1 20011114; ES 2168854 T3 20020616; ID 27498 A 20010412; IL 138640 D0 20011031; MY 129548 A 20070430; PT 1068589 E 20020531; RU 2223546 C2 20040210; US 6880761 B1 20050419; ZA 200005278 B 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 208931 T

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140312

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140319

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6#3050 BERN (CH)

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-11-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-03-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-03-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SWISSCOM FIXNET AG

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-03-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

2010-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SWISSCOM AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6#3050 BERN (CH)

2010-01-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091217 AND 20091223

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RENTSCH & PARTNER

2008-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Free text: SWISSCOM MOBILE AG#SCHWARZTORSTRASSE 61#3050 BERN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- SWISSCOM (SCHWEIZ) AG#ALTE TIEFENAUSTRASSE 6#3050 BERN (CH)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168854 T3

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-02-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900439 20011220

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208931 T 20011115

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SWISSCOM MOBILE AG

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000914

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE