Global Patent Index - EP 1068600 B1

EP 1068600 B1 2002-12-18 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1068600 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919064 A

Priority

  • DE 9900667 W
  • DE 19815015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815015A1] The invention relates to an electrical device (1), especially an automotive radio, with a more user-friendly means of checking access authorization. The inventive electrical device (1) comprises a drive (5) for a storage medium (10). A read device (15) is provided for reading out data the stored on the storage medium (10) when said storage medium is placed in the drive. Device-specific data are filed in a memory (20) allocated to the electrical device (1). The data read out from the storage medium (10) are compared to the device-specific data and the electrical device (1) is only started if the read-out data and the device-specific data match.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/24; B60R 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/00 (2006.01); G08B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/2482 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815015 A1 19991007; EP 1068600 A1 20010117; EP 1068600 B1 20021218; EP 1068600 B2 20061018; JP 2002510829 A 20020409; US 6850471 B1 20050201; WO 9952089 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2007-06-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-05-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021218

2006-10-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFTFUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE E.

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903833 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903833 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE