Global Patent Index - EP 1068603 A1

EP 1068603 A1 2001-01-17 - UPGRADEABLE REMOTE CONTROL

Title (en)

UPGRADEABLE REMOTE CONTROL

Title (de)

AKTUALISIERBARE FERNBEDIENUNG

Title (fr)

TELECOMMANDE EVOLUTIVE

Publication

EP 1068603 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915089 A

Priority

  • US 9906796 W
  • US 7983298 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950807A1] A remote control system includes: a remote device having a CPU, a memory coupled to the CPU for storing operating software and code data for controlling external devices, and keys coupled to the CPU for inputting commands to the remote device; a receiver on the remote device being coupled to the CPU for receiving at least one of operating software and code data over a wireless communication link and transmitting the at least one of operating software and code data to the CPU for decoding; and a transmitter on the remote device being coupled to the CPU for transmitting control data to the external devices, and for transmitting data to an updater; wherein the updater has an updater receiver for receiving data from the transmitter of the remote device and an updater transmitter for transmitting the at least one of operating software and code data to the receiver on the control device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950807A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950807 A1 19991007; AU 3369099 A 19991018; CA 2326555 A1 19991007; EP 1068603 A1 20010117; EP 1068603 B1 20040428; PT 1068603 E 20040930

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080330

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080330

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-10-15 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2006-03-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ICX GLOBAL INC.

2004-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040726

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB PT

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001018

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): GB PT