Global Patent Index - EP 1068604 A1

EP 1068604 A1 2001-01-17 - SKETCHING DEVICE FOR TACTILE GRAPHICS

Title (en)

SKETCHING DEVICE FOR TACTILE GRAPHICS

Title (de)

SKIZZIERGERÄT FÜR ERTASTBARE GRAPHIKEN

Title (fr)

EQUIPEMENT PERMETTANT DE REALISER DES GRAPHIQUES TACTILES

Publication

EP 1068604 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909173 A

Priority

IN 9900002 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0043976A1] This invention relates to a sketching device for use by a blind person comprising a pen body (1) secured to a metallic encloser (2), slaughts being provided in the opposite sides of said encloser for holding a bobbin spool (3) secured on an axle for winding acrylic or wool thread (5) thereon, a knob being provided at both the ends of said axle for winding said thread (5) in the bobbin spool (3), means (4) being provided at the writing end of the pen body for cutting the thread.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09B 21/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0043976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0043976 A1 20000727; DE 69931154 D1 20060608; DE 69931154 T2 20070215; EP 1068604 A1 20010117; EP 1068604 B1 20060503

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120125

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120125

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-11-03 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Free text: RESTORATION ALLOWED

- Effective date: 20101007

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100125

2010-09-08 [REG GB S28] RESTORATION OF CEASED PATENTS (SECT. 28/PAT. ACT 1977)

- Free text: APPLICATION FILED

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931154 P 20060608

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE