Global Patent Index - EP 1068606 A4

EP 1068606 A4 2001-01-24 - PERSONALISED STAMPS

Title (en)

PERSONALISED STAMPS

Title (de)

PERSONALISIERTE BRIEFMARKEN

Title (fr)

TIMBRES PERSONNALISES

Publication

EP 1068606 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99918969 A

Priority

  • AU 9900346 W
  • AU PP351798 A
  • AU PP883199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9960551A1] Postage stamps (3) are produced which enable individual personalisation with an image chosen by a person wishing to use the postage stamp (3). Each stamp has a primary area (9) on which an official stamp image required for postal validation is applied. Each stamp (3) also has a secondary area (11) where a personalising image can be applied. The personalising image can be any image and in one example can comprise the face of a person applying the stamp (3) to a postal article. The personalising image in the secondary area (11) is applied as a second printing process to the stamp (3). Each stamp (3) is produced in a sheet of stamps and can be separated from the sheet for applying to the postal article so that the stamp contains both the primary area (9) and the secondary area (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/00; G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 11/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9960551 A1 19991125; BR 9910446 A 20010102; CA 2330112 A1 19991125; CN 1301375 A 20010627; EP 1068606 A1 20010117; EP 1068606 A4 20010124; GB 0014041 D0 20000802; GB 2347404 A 20000906; GB 2347404 B 20010404; ID 28719 A 20010628; JP 2002516227 A 20020604; NZ 507370 A 20020426

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-02-23 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2001-01-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000609

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE