Global Patent Index - EP 1068625 A1

EP 1068625 A1 2001-01-17 - DRIVE DEVICES FOR INTERRUPTER UNITS IN POWER SUPPLY SWITCHING DEVICES

Title (en)

DRIVE DEVICES FOR INTERRUPTER UNITS IN POWER SUPPLY SWITCHING DEVICES

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSEINRICHTUNGEN FÜR UNTERBRECHEREINHEITEN VON SCHALTGERÄTEN ZUR ENERGIEVERSORGUNG UND -VERTEILUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIFS D'ENTRAINEMENT DESTINES A DES UNITES DE SECTIONNEMENT D'APPAREILS DE CONNEXION D'ALIMENTATION ET DE DISTRIBUTION D'ENERGIE

Publication

EP 1068625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924675 A

Priority

  • DE 9900889 W
  • DE 19815538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815538A1] The invention relates to drive devices for interrupter units in power supply and distribution switching units, especially for vacuum circuit breakers in medium voltage switching devices. Said drive devices comprise lifting devices (HA) controlled by a magnetic coil drive for actuating the movable contact members of the switching devices by means of coupling bars. Each switching device is fitted with at least one pole member and a drive member. Each magnetic coil drive has a movable armature and an on coil and an off coil. The magnetic coil drives of the interrupter units are replaced by linear motor drives (LA) whose integrated lifting devices (HA) directly bring about gearless actuation of the movable contact parts of the switching devices. The movements relevant to switching can be influenced by a control unit optimizing the switching operation. Said drive devices are used in interrupter units for power supply and distribution switching devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/36 (2013.01); H01H 2003/268 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950869A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815538 A1 19991007; CN 1201355 C 20050511; CN 1300441 A 20010620; EP 1068625 A1 20010117; EP 1068625 B1 20020731; ES 2181441 T3 20030216; HK 1038277 A1 20050902; US 6849971 B1 20050201; WO 9950869 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090319

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090320

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090320

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181441 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902191 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000928

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT