Global patent index - EP 1068629 A1

EP 1068629 A1 2001-01-17 - ELECTRON GUN OF THE "ELECTRON TORCH" TYPE

Title (en)

ELECTRON GUN OF THE "ELECTRON TORCH" TYPE

Title (de)

ELEKTRONENKANONE VOM ELEKTRONENFACKEL-TYP

Title (fr)

CANON A ELECTRONS DE TYPE "TORCHE A ELECTRONS"

Publication

EP 1068629 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99911868 A

Priority

  • FR 9900775 W
  • FR 9804177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777113A1] The invention concerns an electron-emitting device comprising: a chamber (8) closed on one side by a membrane (6) capable of being traversed by an electron beam (4); a cathode with at least one microtip (2), for emitting an electron beam (4), characterised in that the cathode microtips are distributed by zones, according to a certain patterns, each zone comprising at least one microtip, the membrane having planar zones (26-1, 26-3) and one or several thicker reinforcing zones (26-2, 26-4, 26-6) separating the planar zones, each microtip zone being opposite a planar zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 33/02 (2006.01); H01J 33/00 (2006.01); H01J 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952124A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777113 A1 19991008; FR 2777113 B1 20000505; DE 69902156 D1 20020822; DE 69902156 T2 20030327; EP 1068629 A1 20010117; EP 1068629 B1 20020717; JP 2002510848 A 20020409; WO 9952124 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060402

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060402

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050403

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902156

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-01-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL