Global Patent Index - EP 1068643 A1

EP 1068643 A1 2001-01-17 - OPTOELECTRONIC MODULE

Title (en)

OPTOELECTRONIC MODULE

Title (de)

OPTOELEKTRONISCHE BAUGRUPPE

Title (fr)

MODULE OPTO-ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1068643 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915685 A

Priority

  • DE 29805392 U
  • EP 9901919 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912720A1] The component group has a transparent substrate (2) with conductor paths (3, 4), and an optoelectronic chip (6) with at least one sensor (9, 10) and/or light sender (11). By means of connector elements (7, 8), the chip is joined to the conductor paths, and is kept at a distance from the transparent substrate. Light blocking elements (19) prevent lateral light incidence into the sensors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/347 (2006.01); G01D 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01D 5/38 (2013.01); G01D 5/34715 (2013.01); H01L 2224/48091 (2013.01); H01L 2924/3025 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/48091 + H01L 2924/00014
  2. H01L 2924/3025 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949514A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805392 U1 19990805; DE 19912720 A1 19991028; EP 1068643 A1 20010117; US 6528779 B1 20030304; WO 9949514 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20130607

2013-06-07 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI