Global Patent Index - EP 1068654 A1

EP 1068654 A1 2001-01-17 - CONTACT SYSTEM FOR NON-INSULATED CONTACTING

Title (en)

CONTACT SYSTEM FOR NON-INSULATED CONTACTING

Title (de)

KONTAKTSYSTEM ZUR ABISOLIERFREIEN KONTAKTIERUNG

Title (fr)

CONTACT DESTINE A UN CONTACT NON DENUDE

Publication

EP 1068654 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917792 A

Priority

  • DE 9900770 W
  • DE 19814182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814182A1] The inventive contact system is characterized by a specially formed contact pin (1) whose cutting area has tow roof-like contact surfaces (4) converging in a cutting edge (5). The edges (8) of the contact surfaces (4) and the cutting edge (5) form a tip (9) through which the cutting area can be press into a cable strand and contacted therewith.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 9/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 11/20 (2006.01); H01R 12/67 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/67 (2013.01); H01R 4/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950934A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814182 A1 19991014; DE 19814182 C2 20000511; AT 220249 T 20020715; EP 1068654 A1 20010117; EP 1068654 B1 20020703; WO 9950934 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-06-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030612

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030212

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901934 20020808

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220249 T 20020715

2002-07-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/24 A, 7H 01R 12/08 B, 7H 01R 12/38 B

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CONTACT SYSTEM PROVIDING A CONTACT WITHOUT STRIPPING THE INSULATION

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI