Global Patent Index - EP 1068754 A1

EP 1068754 A1 2001-01-17 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH A BEAMFORMED CONTROL CHANNEL AND METHOD OF SYSTEM CONTROL

Title (en)

COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH A BEAMFORMED CONTROL CHANNEL AND METHOD OF SYSTEM CONTROL

Title (de)

KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINEM STRAHLGEFORMTEN STEUERKANAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR SYSTEMKONTROLLE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION AVEC UN CANAL DE COMMANDE A FORMATION DE FAISCEAUX ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE SYSTEME

Publication

EP 1068754 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97941935 A

Priority

  • EP 9704417 W
  • GB 9619975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2317786A] In response to a system access request on a wide area control channel RACH from a communication unit 42, a base station 32 having an adaptive array of antenna elements forms a directionally radiated narrowbeam control channel BCCH 51 to the unit and transmits control information so that the unit configures itself for communication to and from the base station on a narrowbeam traffic channel TCH. The control channel is not continuously transmitted and not capable of being received by all communication units in a particular cell thus reducing co-channel and adjacent channel interference. Each base station receiving the request transmits such a BCCH and the communication unit selects the strongest signal or the base station receiving the strongest RACH signal is used. The position of the BCCH can be optimised as the communication unit moves, by monitoring RSSI or BER at the unit and re-transmitting a narrow beam RACH signal when necessary for location indication, or monitoring the unit's transmissions at the base station. Alternatively the radiation pattern may be periodically oscillated or pulsed to adjust its width to gain information regarding the exact position of the communication unit. Handover is achieved by retuning to a new base station 26 which has been given the location of the unit 42 by the old base station 32 so that the new base station can direct its BCCH to it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38; H04Q 7/22; H04Q 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H04B 7/10 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04W 16/28 (2009.01); H04W 76/02 (2009.01); H04W 16/24 (2009.01); H04W 24/00 (2009.01); H04W 28/06 (2009.01); H04W 64/00 (2009.01); H04W 74/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 72/046 (2013.01); H04W 16/28 (2013.01); H04W 16/24 (2013.01); H04W 24/00 (2013.01); H04W 28/06 (2013.01); H04W 64/00 (2013.01); H04W 72/042 (2013.01); H04W 74/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9814024A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2317786 A 19980401; GB 2317786 B 20010530; GB 9619975 D0 19961113; CN 1196364 C 20050406; CN 1208540 A 19990217; DE 69738455 D1 20080221; DE 69738455 T2 20081224; EP 1068754 A1 20010117; EP 1068754 B1 20080109; HK 1010301 A1 20011123; JP 2001501061 A 20010123; JP 4071829 B2 20080402; KR 100590435 B1 20060619; KR 20000048621 A 20000725; US 6330459 B1 20011211; WO 9814024 A1 19980402

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150812

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150811

2016-03-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69738455

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140807

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140901

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140801

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-17 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20120716

2012-08-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., US

- Effective date: 20120716

2012-08-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., US

- Effective date: 20120716

2012-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., LIBERTYVILLE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 69738455

- Effective date: 20120618

2012-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738455

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120618

2012-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738455

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB

- Document: DE 69738455

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., LIBERTYVILLE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA LTD., BASINGSTOKE, HAMPSHIRE, GB

- Document: DE 69738455

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738455

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738455

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-02-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2008-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69738455 P 20080221

2008-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2006-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CRICHTON, PAUL

2006-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, PAUL

2006-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSON, NICHOLAS WILLIAM,BLUE SLATES FARM

2006-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBINSON, WILLIAM

2006-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CRICHTON, PAUL

2006-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, PAUL

2006-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSON, NICHOLAS WILLIAM,BLUE SLATES FARM

2006-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBINSON, WILLIAM

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040511

2001-06-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990426

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR SE