Global Patent Index - EP 1068774 A1

EP 1068774 A1 2001-01-17 - INTELLIGENT SPEAKER TUNING USING NON-VOLATILE MEMORY

Title (en)

INTELLIGENT SPEAKER TUNING USING NON-VOLATILE MEMORY

Title (de)

INTELLIGENTE LAUTSPRECHERABSTIMMUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VOM NICHTFLÜCHTIGENSPEICHER

Title (fr)

SYNTONISATION D'UN HAUT PARLEUR INTELLIGENT AU MOYEN D'UNE MEMOIRE NON VOLATILE

Publication

EP 1068774 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00908414 A

Priority

  • US 0002274 W
  • US 23690099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044200A1] A non-intrusive system and method for tuning the speaker (50) is performed by applying a reference signal and a control signal to the input of the programmable speaker (50). A microphone (54) detects a sound corresponding to the input reference signal at the output (53) of the speaker and feeds it back to a tester (55) which analyzes the frequency response of the speaker (50) by comparing the input reference signal to the audible output signal (53) from the speaker (50). Depending on the results of the comparison, the tester provides to the speaker (50) an updated digital control signal with new characterization data which is then stored in the speaker memory (52) and used to again perform transform functions on the input reference signal. The tuning feedback cycle continues until the input reference signal and the audible output signal (53) from the speaker (50) exhibit the desired frequency response as determined by the tester.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 29/00; H03G 11/00; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03G 5/00 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03G 5/005 (2013.01); H04R 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0044200A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044200 A1 20000727; WO 0044200 A9 20011115; AU 2976100 A 20000807; EP 1068774 A1 20010117; JP 2002535946 A 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030407

2002-02-13 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2002-02-13 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Owner name: LEVY, PAUL S.

2002-02-13 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Owner name: SESSIONS, D.C.

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEVY, PAUL S.

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SESSIONS, D.C.

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI