Global Patent Index - EP 1068815 A2

EP 1068815 A2 2001-01-17 - Decorative member and process for producing the decorative member

Title (en)

Decorative member and process for producing the decorative member

Title (de)

Zierelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément décoratif et son procédé de production

Publication

EP 1068815 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114149 A

Priority

JP 20396499 A

Abstract (en)

A decorative member comprising a jewel which comprises a crown portion (4) having a truncated cone shape and a pavilion portion (5) having a cone shape and a holder (3) which comprises three or more nails tightly attached to the crown portion and the pavilion portion of the jewel at linear contacting portions and fixes the jewel; and a process for producing the decorative member in which the nails (3) have a structure such that a solid angle formed by the three or more nails is smaller than a solid angle formed by side faces of the pavilion portion of the jewel and a culet of the jewel as an apex and, when the jewel is inserted between the nails, the nails each have a portion for bending which reaches the crown portion beyond a girdle of the jewel at an end portion thereof and can be bent inward, which process comprises inserting the jewel into the holder by applying a pressure while the nails are elastically deformed by expansion in a radial direction, fixing the jewel by bending the portions for bending of the nails inward at a position of the girdle of the jewel and cutting off unnecessary end portions of the nails while portions of the nails used for fixing the jewel are left remaining. The decorative member has no possibility of detachment of the jewel, exhibits excellent appearance and does not cause allergic irritation. The decorative member is produced in accordance with the above process. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/005 (2013.01); A44C 17/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068815 A2 20010117; EP 1068815 A3 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI