EP 1068817 A3 20021120 - Container for care , hygiene or make-up body products
Title (en)
Container for care , hygiene or make-up body products
Title (de)
Behälter für Pflege- ,Hygiene- und Schminkkörperprodukte
Title (fr)
Conteneur pour produits pour le soin, l'Hygiene et le maquillage du corps
Publication
Application
Priority
IT MI990454 U 19990715
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1068817A2] The container consists of a base (11) with a removable cap (12) and an inner sleeve (13) to hold the stick product (16). The sleeve is equipped with a series of convergent fins (19) to grip the product, which can be introduced in liquid or solid form, and is fixed to the container base by clipping onto a projecting inner ring (17). When the product is introduced in liquid form, through a hole (18) in the base, an inner cover (14) is used to mould its shape.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
A45D 40/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A45D 40/0087 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] US 5092700 A 19920303 - SUSINI CLAUDE [FR], et al
- [X] US 5326185 A 19940705 - DORNBUSCH ARTHUR H [US], et al
- [XA] GB 595772 A 19471216 - CUSSONS SONS & COMPANY LTD, et al
- [A] US 5046875 A 19910910 - SKOLNIK ALBERT B [US]
- [A] FR 2758953 A1 19980807 - OREAL [FR]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 06 28 June 1996 (1996-06-28)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 08 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 07 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1068817 A2 20010117; EP 1068817 A3 20021120; IT 246853 Y1 20020410; IT MI990454 U1 20010115; IT MI990454 V0 19990715
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00420153 A 20000706; IT MI990454 U 19990715