Global Patent Index - EP 1068831 A2

EP 1068831 A2 2001-01-17 - Cleaning device

Title (en)

Cleaning device

Title (de)

Reinigungssystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1068831 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111991 A

Priority

DE 19931875 A

Abstract (en)

A cleaning system for washing machines has a nozzle arrangement (2) with at least two passage openings for at least one cleaning medium (9). The openings generate jets impinging on one another. The opening is designed as a nozzle influencing the jet. The nozzle arrangement is designed as a concave, convex or plane nozzle body (3). The nozzle arrangement is designed as a re-entrant nozzle body which projects into the inner chamber of a region guiding the cleaning medium. The jet generated by several nozzles (12) is formed inside the inner chamber or funnel region of the nozzle body.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Reinigungssystem für Spülmaschinen. Hierbei weist das Reinigungssystem (1) eine Düsenanordnung (2) mit wenigstens zwei Durchtrittsöffnungen (10, 11) für mindestens ein Reinigungsmedium (9) auf, wobei die Durchtrittsöffnungen (10, 11) aufeinandertreffende Strahlen (19a, 20a) erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/16; A47L 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/16 (2006.01); A47L 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4278 (2013.01); A47L 15/16 (2013.01); A47L 15/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19931875 A1 20010111; EP 1068831 A2 20010117; EP 1068831 A3 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI