Global Patent Index - EP 1068837 A1

EP 1068837 A1 2001-01-17 - General purpose distributed operating room control system

Title (en)

General purpose distributed operating room control system

Title (de)

Allzwecksteuerungssystem für verteilte Operationssäle

Title (fr)

Système de commande de salle d'opération reparti à usage général

Publication

EP 1068837 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305831 A

Priority

US 35494499 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention pertains to control systems and provides a run time configurable control system for selecting and operating one of a plurality of operating room devices from a single input source, the system comprising a master controller having a voice control interface and means for routing control signals. The system additionally may include a plurality of slave controllers to provide expandability of the system. Also, the system includes output means for generating messages to the user relating to the status of the control system in general and to the status of devices connected thereto. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/00; G10L 15/26; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 19/00 (2006.01); G05B 15/02 (2006.01); G05B 23/02 (2006.01); G06F 3/16 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2011.01); G10L 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/3412 (2013.01); A61B 17/00 (2013.01); A61B 34/70 (2016.02); A61B 34/74 (2016.02); A61B 90/30 (2013.01); G05B 15/02 (2013.01); G06F 19/3406 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00017 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00119 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00203 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00973 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

[X] WO 9921165 A1 19990429 - COMPUTER MOTION INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068837 A1 20010117; CA 2313996 A1 20010115; CA 2313996 C 20070403; JP 2001104336 A 20010417; US 2001040496 A1 20011115; US 2003197590 A1 20031023; US 2005242919 A1 20051103; US 6496099 B2 20021217; US 6943663 B2 20050913; US 7259652 B2 20070821

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI