Global patent index - EP 1068850 A2

EP 1068850 A2 2001-01-17 - Single-dose bottle for drinkable liquids, particularly for pharmaceutical products

Title (en)

Single-dose bottle for drinkable liquids, particularly for pharmaceutical products

Title (de)

Einzeldosierbare Flasche für trinkbare Flüssigkeiten, insbesondere Arzneimittel

Title (fr)

Flacon à dose unique pour boissons, en particulier pour produits pharmaceutiques

Publication

EP 1068850 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114117 A

Priority

IT MO990032 U

Abstract (en)

A single-dose bottle for drinkable liquids, particularly for pharmaceutical products, is constituted by a body (2) which contains the dose of the liquid to be drunk and has, at one end, a neck (3) which has a dispensing opening (4) and a closure (5) for closing the opening (4) whose profile is complementary to the profile of the neck (3) and is connected thereto along a predetermined fracture line (6), the profiles of the neck (3), of the closure (5) and of the fracture line (6) being adapted to form an anatomically contoured shape of the opening (4) for direct resting thereon of the user's lips after the closure (5) has been removed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/00 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01); B65D 1/09 (2006.01); A61J 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 7/0046 (2013.01); B65D 1/0238 (2013.01); B65D 1/095 (2013.01); A61J 1/065 (2013.01); A61J 7/0015 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT MO990032 U 19990714

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068850 A2 20010117; EP 1068850 A3 20020130; AR 028842 A1 20030528; BR 0002798 A 20010313; ID 26543 A 20010118; IT 248511 Y1 20030204; IT MO990032 U1 20010115; IT MO990032 V0 19990714; MX PA00006981 A 20031211

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041214

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040706

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI