Global Patent Index - EP 1068885 A2

EP 1068885 A2 2001-01-17 - Lottery system

Title (en)

Lottery system

Title (de)

Lottosystem

Title (fr)

Système de loterie

Publication

EP 1068885 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306020 A

Priority

GB 9916679 A

Abstract (en)

A video lottery system comprises a central controller (10) that provides fixed pools of chances in electronic form. These are downloaded on request to a local master (30) at a given location (40) such as a club. The local master is connected to a ticket dispenser (50). A person wishing to play a game of chance approaches a vendor in the location (40), who enters information into the ticket dispenser (50) in exchange for cash. The ticket dispenser prints out a ticket and this is handed to the player. Each ticket printed represents a fixed chance (win or lose) obtained from the fixed pool. The player inserts the purchased ticket into a separate lottery machine (60) which reads the ticket and indicates to the player, via a screen (70), whether the ticket represents a winning or losing chance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 3/08; A63F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 3/081 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9412256 A1 19940609 - INFINATIONAL TECH INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068885 A2 20010117; EP 1068885 A3 20010829; GB 2356149 A 20010516; GB 2356149 B 20040121; GB 9916679 D0 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020302

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 63F 3/08 A, 7A 63F 3/06 B, 7G 07F 17/32 B, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI