Global patent index - EP 1068916 A1

EP 1068916 A1 2001-01-17 - Method of manufacturing composite metal sandwich sheet by rolling

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing composite metal sandwich sheet by rolling

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Verbundblechen durch Walzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de tôle composite avec une structure sandwich par laminage

Publication

EP 1068916 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112624 A

Priority

DE 19930982 A

Abstract (en)

Production of composite sheets made up of covering layers of sturdy material and a core layer between them comprises molding a flat closed hollow profile in the passage made of a strip material; filling the hollow mold with a metal powder mixture; and compacting the hollow profile and the powder mixture by rolling so that the powder mixture goes into the surface of the hollow profile on all sides.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Verbundblechen durch Walzen, bei dem ein Band im Durchlauf zu einem flachen Hohlprofil geformt wird, dessen Hohlraum mit einer Pulvermischung gefüllt ist, wobei die Pulvermischung durch Walzen so kompaktiert wird, daß sie in sich und mit dem Bandmaterial einen metallischen Verbund eingeht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 7/08; B22F 3/11; B22F 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/18 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); B22F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/006 (2013.01); B22F 3/18 (2013.01); B22F 7/08 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 7/08 + B22F 3/1208
  2. B22F 2998/00 + C22C 47/14

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068916 A1 20010117; DE 19930982 C1 20010308

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI