Global Patent Index - EP 1068929 A2

EP 1068929 A2 2001-01-17 - Screw driving tool

Title (en)

Screw driving tool

Title (de)

Schraubwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de vissage

Publication

EP 1068929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114653 A

Priority

DE 29912232 U

Abstract (en)

The tool (1) has a clamp (8) which is shaped like a question mark. The clamp has a half-round portion with internal projections (20) which may grip the hexagonal head of a screw. The straight end of the question mark shape is pivoted (10,19) inside the hollow handle (2). It is spring-loaded (11) against a stop (9) so that it bears against it when the tool is turned in the tightening direction and is moved away from it when it turns in the release direction. A control blade (12) extends from the other side of the stop toward the end of the clamp, and may be moved longitudinally by a slider (13) moved by a button (17) sliding in a slit (18) in the handle.

Abstract (de)

Schraubwerkzeug (1) mit einem Griff (2); einem Spannbügel (8), der an seinem einen Ende am Griff (2) schwenkbar gelagert und an seinem anderen vom Griff (2) entfernten Ende teilkreisförmig gebogen ist; einem Anschlag (9) für den Spannbügel (8), der an der konkaven Seite des Spannbügels (8) am Griff (2) befestigt ist; einer am Griff (2) vorhandenen Rückstelleinrichtung (11), die den Spannbügel (8) gegen den Anschlag (9) drückt; und einem vom Griff (2) gehaltenen Stellglied (12), das mit seinem freien Ende der konkaven Seite des teilkreisförmig gebogenen Endes des Spannbügels (8) im Abstand gegenüberliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/12; B25B 13/28; B25B 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/481 (2013.01); B25B 13/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29912232 U1 19990930; EP 1068929 A2 20010117; EP 1068929 A3 20030611; US 6412371 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25B 13/48 A

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STORM, SIEGFRIED

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI