Global Patent Index - EP 1068930 A2

EP 1068930 A2 2001-01-17 - Insert for a wrench

Title (en)

Insert for a wrench

Title (de)

Einsatzwerkzeug für einen Schlüssel

Title (fr)

Insert pour une clef

Publication

EP 1068930 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00114372 A

Priority

DE 19932353 A

Abstract (en)

The insert tool has an insert section (4) designed to fit into the opening (1) of the ring spanner (2) and then fixable secured against rotation. A tool section (3) is provided for transferring torque and fixing means fix the tool in the opening of the spanner. The insert section is defined by a collar (5). The tool can be fixed in the opening of the spanner by clamp fit produced by a spring-tensioned element.

Abstract (de)

Zur Übertragung eines Drehmoments schlägt die Erfindung ein Einsatzwerkzeug vor, das mit einem Einsteckabschnitt in eine Öffnung eines Schlüssels eingesetzt und dort festgelegt wird. Der Einsteckabschnitt weist vorzugsweise die Form eines regelmäßigen Sechsecks auf. Mit diesem Werkzeug können auch solche Bauelemente verdreht werden, die zum Antrieb eine Vertiefung aufweisen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/00; B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/001 (2013.01); B25B 15/008 (2013.01); B25B 23/0035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19932353 A1 20010111; EP 1068930 A2 20010117; EP 1068930 A3 20011128

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020529

2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI