Global patent index - EP 1068937 A1

EP 1068937 A1 2001-01-17 - Cutter blade for severing adhesive beads on window panes

Title (en)

Cutter blade for severing adhesive beads on window panes

Title (de)

Schneidmesser zum Durchtrennen von Klebewulsten an Fensterscheiben

Title (fr)

Lame de coupe pour couper des bourrelets adhésifs aux vitres

Publication

EP 1068937 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111233 A

Priority

DE 19932248 A

Abstract (en)

The cutting blade has a U-shaped angle with a first arm formed as the fastening part (32a) which is connected by an intermediate web (36a) to a second outer arm formed as a cutting part (34a). The fastening part is angled at the end facing the intermediate web. The angled arm can be formed on a side facing the cutting part through a section of a side edge of the fastening part which is curved concave relative to the fastening opening.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Schneidmesser für ein Schneidwerkzeug zum Durchtrennen von Klebewulsten an Fensterscheiben von Fahrzeugen angegeben, mit einem U-förmig gewinkelten Querschnitt umfassend einen ersten, als Befestigungsteil 32a ausgebildeten Schenkel mit einer Befestigungsöffnung 18a zur Befestigung an einem Oszillationsantrieb, sowie einen zweiten Schenkel, der als Schneidteil 34a ausgebildet ist und über einen Zwischensteg 36a mit dem Befestigungsteil 32a verbunden ist, wobei der Befestigungsteil eben ausgebildet ist und sich von der Befestigungsöffnung 18a aus zum Zwischenteil 36a hin verjüngt. Der Befestigungsteil 32a weist vorzugsweise an seinem dem Zwischensteg 36a zugewandten Ende eine Abkröpfung 42a auf; ferner ist vorzugsweise am Schneidteil 34a ein Wellen- oder Sägezahnschliff vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19932248 A1 20010111; EP 1068937 A1 20010117; EP 1068937 B1 20020821; US 6401342 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080525

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080525

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080525

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070508

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000388

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010519

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI