Global Patent Index - EP 1068939 A2

EP 1068939 A2 2001-01-17 - Apparatus for separating parts from a band of film material

Title (en)

Apparatus for separating parts from a band of film material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herauslösen von Teilbereichen aus einem bahnartigen Folienmaterial

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des éléments d'une bande de matériau en film

Publication

EP 1068939 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113958 A

Priority

DE 29911914 U

Abstract (en)

The device has a cutting edge (51), which is pressed through the moving foil material (20) in a rolling or slicing motion. The cutting edge is formed by the free edge section of a knife blade. A pressure member is pressed against the blade and moved along it, to cut through the foil. The foil moves between an anvil and the knife blade, and is fixed in position by under pressure. An elastically compressible buffer part (66,68) is positioned beside the knife blade. The blade may form a closed ring fastened to a plate. The foil material may be the collar-like edge of a filled bag, which is connected to a lower foil length (12). This forms a container (16) with contents, and there is also an upper foil forming a sealed lid. Both foils are water-soluble.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Herauslösen von Teilbereichen aus einem bahnartigen Folienmaterial (20) besitzt eine Schneidkante (51), die in einer Wälzbewegung und/oder in einem ziehenden Schnitt durch die Folienmaterial-Bahn (20) durchdrückbar oder hindurchziehbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/16; B26F 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/16 (2006.01); B25B 11/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/44 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/02 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01); B26F 1/38 (2006.01); B26F 1/42 (2006.01); B26F 1/44 (2006.01); B26F 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/42 (2013.01); B25B 5/163 (2013.01); B25B 11/005 (2013.01); B26D 1/445 (2013.01); B26D 7/018 (2013.01); B26D 7/02 (2013.01); B26D 7/025 (2013.01); B26D 7/1818 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26F 1/3826 (2013.01); B26F 1/3846 (2013.01); B26D 1/285 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911914 U1 19990909; DE 50012033 D1 20060330; EP 1068939 A2 20010117; EP 1068939 A3 20010808; EP 1068939 B1 20040225; EP 1358976 A1 20031105; EP 1358976 B1 20060104

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070730

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-07-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005385

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT NL

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011208

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 26F 1/16 A, 7B 26F 1/42 B, 7B 26F 1/38 B, 7B 26D 7/01 B, 7B 26D 1/44 B

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 26F 1/16 A, 7B 26F 1/42 B, 7B 26F 1/38 B, 7B 26D 7/01 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI