Global Patent Index - EP 1068940 A2

EP 1068940 A2 2001-01-17 - Cutting rule to be set in the groove of a rule holder

Title (en)

Cutting rule to be set in the groove of a rule holder

Title (de)

Bandförmiges Stanzmesser zur Halterung in einem Schlitz eines Messerträgers

Title (fr)

Outil de coupe aux filets destiné à être monté dans une rainure d'un support d'outil

Publication

EP 1068940 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113424 A

Priority

DE 19931216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19931216C1] The stamping blade (2), of strip steel (4), is held within a slit (18) in the blade carrier (20) with a cutting edge (8) at the hardened free end (6). The other end is shaped with a laying support surface (10) and a thinner zone (12) at a gap from the base. The thinner zone (12) is at the section of the blade holder where the holding slit (18) has been cut by a laser with a barrel-shaped expansion, and where there is no requirement for a blade side support or where there is no effect on the stamping through a lack of a side support.

Abstract (de)

Bandförmiges Stanzmesser (2) zur Halterung in einem Schlitz (18) eines Messerträgers (20), bestehend aus Bandstahl (4) mit einer als Schneide (8) ausgebildeten gehärteten Kante (6), mit einer der gehärteten Kante (6) gegenüber verlaufenden Anlagefläche (10) und mit einem eine Verformungszone bildenden querschnittsreduzierten Bereich (12). Der querschnittsreduzierte Bereich (12) verläuft in einem Abstand von der Anlagefläche (10). Der querschnittsreduzierte Bereich (12) befindet sich also in einem Bereich, in dem keine Führung möglich ist, wenn der Schlitz (18) in der heute üblichen Weise durch Laserbearbeitung erzeugt, im mittleren Bereich also tonnenförmig erweitert ist. Der querschnittsreduzierte Bereich (12) liegt also dort, wo eine seitliche Führung nicht erforderlich ist oder das Fehlen einer seitlichen Führung sich nicht nachteilig auswirkt. Das bandförmige Stanzmesser (2) kann dadurch im Gebrauch nicht seitlich kippen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4463 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4472 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19931216 C1 20001116; EP 1068940 A2 20010117; EP 1068940 A3 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI