Global Patent Index - EP 1068953 A1

EP 1068953 A1 2001-01-17 - Silk-screen printing method and printing machine that carries out this method

Title (en)

Silk-screen printing method and printing machine that carries out this method

Title (de)

Siebdruckverfahren und Siebdruckmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression par sérigraphie et machine pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 1068953 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00112878 A

Priority

IT PI990037 A

Abstract (en)

A silk-screen printing machine (1) comprising a base frame (2) with respect to which a flat support (3) for a sheet (4) can move from a loading position (5) to a printing position (6) under a silk-screen (7), having a silk screen (7'), relatively to which a support (8) can slide comprising a doctor (9) and a counter-doctor (10). Above the printing zone (6) a shield (11) is provided suitable for protecting the operator from the vapour of ink present on the silk cloth (7). The base frame (2), at the loading zone (5), has positioning registers of reference (12,13) suitable for allowing the location of the sheet (4) with respect to the flat support (3), so that when the latter is located in the printing zone (6) the sheet (4) is positioned correctly with respect to the silk-screen (7). The flat support (3) is of vacuum type and has a projecting grid (20) on which the sheet (4') already printed in a previous step can rest. The machine provides furthermore two pawls (21,22) that engage with the flat support (3) and the grid (20). Opposite to the loading zone (5) an unloading zone (14) is provided where a conveyor belt (23) is present. At the end of the printing step, the back stroke of the flat support (3) towards the loading position (5) is effected, and the pawls (21, 22) block the back stroke of the sheet just printed (4) and the sheet previously printed (4'), which fall respectively on the grid (20) and on an unloading zone (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068953 A1 20010117; IT 1309853 B1 20020205; IT PI990037 A1 20001218

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060103

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040102

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI