Global patent index - EP 1068955 A1

EP 1068955 A1 2001-01-17 - Device for changing the amplitude of the axial oscillation of an inking roller in a rotary printing machine

Title (en)

Device for changing the amplitude of the axial oscillation of an inking roller in a rotary printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Hubamplitude einer Reibwalze in einer Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour changer l'amplitude de l'oscillation axiale d'un rouleau d'encrage dans une machine rotative d'impression

Publication

EP 1068955 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120285 A

Priority

  • DE 19756077 A
  • EP 98122118 A

Abstract (en)

The adjustment device uses a setting drive (39) for movement of a guide (37) provided with a guide slot (40) for a guide pin between 2 alternate positions relative to a drive element (52) of the drive train (43) for the oscillating roller (15,16), the setting drive supported by at least one element of the latter drive train. An Independent claim for a rotary printing machine is also included.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Hubamplitute mindestens einer axial oszillierenden Reibwalze (15; 16) in einem Auftragswerk (6) einer Rotationsdruckmaschine, wobei die Reibwalze (15; 16) durch einen Reiberhubantrieb (35) über ein Reiberhubgetriebe (43) antreibbar ist, welches eine Kulisse (37) mit einer Nut (40) und einem in der Nut (40) bewegbaren Kulissenstein (42) umfaßt und wobei die Kulisse (37) von einem ersten Getriebeglied (52) und der Kulissenstein (32) von einem zweiten Getriebeglied (47) des Reiberhubgetriebes (43) getragen wird und beide Getriebeglieder (47, 52) durch den Reiberhubantrieb (35) antreibbar sind. Die Vorrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Kulisse (37) durch einen Stellantrieb (39) von einer ersten Stellung in eine zweite Stellung relativ zum ersten Getriebeglied (52) verstellbar angeordnet ist und daß der Stellantrieb (39) von mindestens einem der Getriebeglieder (47; 52) getragen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/36 (2006.01); B41F 31/15 (2006.01); B41F 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924072 A1 19990623; EP 0924072 B1 20010822; DE 19756077 A1 19990624; EP 1068955 A1 20010117; EP 1068955 B1 20030521; JP 4347935 B2 20091021; JP H11240139 A 19990907; US 6578481 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0924072

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000928

2001-01-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 924072

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL