Global Patent Index - EP 1068961 A2

EP 1068961 A2 2001-01-17 - Process for mounting a printing plate on a relief printing cylinder and the relief printing cylinder

Title (en)

Process for mounting a printing plate on a relief printing cylinder and the relief printing cylinder

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Anbringen einer Klischeeplatte auf einem Patrizen-Zylinder sowie Patrizen-Zylinder

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fixation d'une plaque d'impression sur un cylindre pour l'impression en relief et cylindre pour l'impression en relief

Publication

EP 1068961 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890202 A

Priority

AT 48799 U

Abstract (en)

Mounting of a plate (4) having an embossed relief (7) onto a patrix cylinder (2) which turns synchronously with a co-operating matrix cylinder (3) in a rotary embossing machine is achieved by first provisionally fixing plate (4), which has an adhesive (6) on its reverse side, to the matrix cylinder (3) and then transferring it to the patrix cylinder (2) making use of the fact that the provisional bond is of lower strength than the bond between plate (4) and adhesive (6). Mounting of a plate (4) having an embossed relief (7) onto a patrix cylinder (2) which turns synchronously with a co-operating matrix cylinder (3) in a rotary embossing machine is achieved by first provisionally fixing plate (4), which has an adhesive (6) on its reverse side, to the matrix cylinder (3), the embossed side facing the matrix and the bonding being at each negative form (5) corresponding to the relief (7). The adhesive strength of this provisional bond is less than that between the layer (6) and the plate (4), and plate (4) is transferred to the patrix cylinder (2) by synchronous turning of the cylinders (2 and 3) such that the plate (4) is detached from the matrix cylinder (3) and automatically stuck via adhesive (6) to the patrix cylinder (2) at the appropriate positions. An Independent claim is also included for a patrix cylinder (2) having fixed to it a plate (4) with an embossed relief (7) on its outer side.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Anbringen einer Klischeeplatte (4), die ein Prägerelief (7) aufweist, auf einem Patrizen-Zylinder (2) eines Rotationsprägewerkes (1), das weiters einen mit dem Patrizen-Zylinder (2) zusammenarbeitenden, mit diesem synchron umlaufenden Matrizen-Zylinder (3) aufweist; die mit einem Klebematerial (6) an ihrer Rückseite ausgerüstete Klischeeplatte (4) wird mit der Prägerelief-Seite am Matrizen-Zylinder (3) an jener Stelle, die die zum Prägerelief (7) zugehörige Negativ-Form (5) enthält, durch Ankleben vorläufig fixiert, wobei die Klebekraft für dieses vorläufige Fixieren geringer ist als die vom Klebematerial (6) an der Rückseite der Klischeeplatte (4) vorgesehene Klebekraft, und danach wird die Klischeeplatte (4) durch synchrones, gegenseitiges Drehen der beiden Zylinder (2, 3) vom Matrizen-Zylinder (3) auf den Patrizen-Zylinder (2) übertragen und dort selbsttätig an der korrespondierenden Stelle (8) durch die Klebekraft des rückseitigen Klebematerials (6) angeklebt, wobei die Klischeeplatte (4) vom Matrizen-Zylinder (3) gelöst wird. Der erfindungsgemäße Patrizen-Zylinder (2) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Klischeeplatte (4) mit ihrer Rückseite auf dem Zylindermantel angeklebt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 6/02; B41N 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01); B41N 1/22 (2006.01); B41N 6/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/22 (2013.01); B41F 27/1275 (2013.01); B41N 6/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068961 A2 20010117; EP 1068961 A3 20030618; AT 3802 U1 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41N 6/02 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41N 1/22 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 27/00 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 41F 27/12 B

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI