Global Patent Index - EP 1068962 A2

EP 1068962 A2 2001-01-17 - Box, in particular paint box

Title (en)

Box, in particular paint box

Title (de)

Kasten, insbesondere Farbkasten

Title (fr)

Boîtes, notamment boîtes à peintures

Publication

EP 1068962 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113985 A

Priority

DE 19932306 A

Abstract (en)

The paint-box has top box containing a set of compartments open at the top, and a lid.(2) A bottom box has a set of compartments open at the top. The underside of the top box (1) is placed on the bottom box (3) so as to close the bottom box, by means of an attachment with interlocking and detachable holder elements. The fastening can be released by a press-button (9) operated from above and positioned on the top or bottom box.

Abstract (de)

Ein Farbkasten (1) mit einem Oberkasten mit einem oben offenen Gefach und einem Deckel (2) zum Verschließen des Gefachs ist mit seiner Unterseite auf einen Unterkasten (3) in einer das Gefach des Unterkastens (3) verschließenden und durch formschlüssig ineinandergreifende Orientierungsmittel bestimmten Position aufsetzbar. Zum Befestigen des Oberkastens (1) auf dem Unterkasten (3) ist eine lösbare Halterung und ein die Halterung verriegelnder, lösbarer Verschluß vorgesehen, der durch eine von oben zu betätigende Drucktaste (9) lösbar ist, die an dem Unterkasten (3) angeordnet ist. Über der Drucktaste (9) ist an dem Oberkasten (1) seitlich versetzt eine zweite Drucktaste (8) angeordnet, die zum Lösen eines den Deckel (2) haltenden Verschlußes dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44D 3/04; A45D 40/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068962 A2 20010117; EP 1068962 A3 20031008; EP 1068962 B1 20060329; AT 321673 T 20060415; DE 19932306 C1 20010208; DE 50012463 D1 20060518

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PELIKAN PBS-PRODUKTIONSG.- M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20110731

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110201

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012463 P 20060518

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2004-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040313

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 44D 3/04 A

2003-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 45D 40/22 B

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PELIKAN PBS-PRODUKTIONSGESELLSCHAFT MBH & CO.

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI