Global Patent Index - EP 1068980 A2

EP 1068980 A2 2001-01-17 - Fuel tank

Title (en)

Fuel tank

Title (de)

Kraftstofftank

Title (fr)

Réservoir de carburant

Publication

EP 1068980 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114678 A

Priority

  • JP 20374699 A
  • JP 26293899 A
  • JP 32519699 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel tank (T) includes a breather pipe (13). In the intermediate portion of the breather pipe (13), there is formed a downwardly curved portion (132) which is used to avoid the interference of the breather pipe 13 with a car body frame (16). A communicating passage (17) allows fuel stored in the downwardly curved portion to flow into a filler pipe. In another embodiment a jet pump (19), which can be operated by fuel returned from an engine, is connected to the downwardly curved portion (132) of the breather pipe (13) by a stored fuel suction pipe (20), so that fuel stored in the downwardly curved portion (132) can be sucked and discharged due to the operation of the jet pump (19). A float valve (21) can close one end portion of the breather pipe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 15/073; B60K 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/04 (2006.01); B60K 15/073 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60K 15/04 (2013.01); B60K 15/073 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1068980 A2 20010117; EP 1068980 A3 20030108; EP 1068980 B1 20050518; BR 0002740 A 20010313; DE 60020191 D1 20050623; DE 60020191 T2 20051013

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60020191

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150701

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020191 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI