Global Patent Index - EP 1069019 A1

EP 1069019 A1 2001-01-17 - Device for producing an electrical connection

Title (en)

Device for producing an electrical connection

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Realisierung einer elektrischen Steckverbindung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour realiser une connexion électrique

Publication

EP 1069019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113087 A

Priority

DE 19932469 A

Abstract (en)

A plug-in device (3) has one or more first electrical contacts (2a) to operate together with second electrical contacts (4a,4d) in a plug-in element (5) by plugging-in. Flat surfaces of the contacts come together. The plug-in device carries six electrical contacts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Realisierung einer elektrischen Verbindung (1,1.2,1.3), umfassend eine Steckeinrichtung (3,3.2,3.3) mit wenigstens einem oder einer Vielzahl erster elektrischer Kontakte (2,2a-2f), die mit dazu komplementären zweiten elektrischen Kontakten (4a-4f) eines Steckelementes (5,5.2,5.3) durch Einstecken und gegenseitigem Berühren der Kontaktflächen in Wirkverbindung bringbar sind. Zur elektrischen Koppelung von Steckeinrichtung und Steckelement werden die elektrischen Kontakte (2a-2f,4a-4f) der Steckeinrichtung mit den elektrischen Kontakten am Steckelement durch Einstecken des Steckelementes (5,5.2,5.3) in die Steckeinrichtung (3,3.2,3.3) in Wirkverbindung gebracht. Dies erfolgt durch flächiges Anliegen der Kontakte aneinander. Erfindungsgemäß wird dies durch die Ausbildung der Kontaktflächen an der Steckeinrichtung bzw. am Steckelement als Schmiegeflächen (8a-8f,9a-9f), welche in einem Winkel zur Einführachse des Steckelementes in die Steckeinrichtung im Querschnitt der Vorrichtung betrachtet ausgerichtet und gekrümmt ausgeführt sind, realisiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 5/10; H01R 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/10 (2006.01); H01R 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/10 (2013.01); H01R 35/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069019 A1 20010117; EP 1069019 B1 20030129; DE 19932469 A1 20010208; DE 19932469 C2 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001157

- Effective date: 20120103

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060628

2005-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040627

2004-06-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040627

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001157 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI