Global Patent Index - EP 1069041 A2

EP 1069041 A2 2001-01-17 - Life collar

Title (en)

Life collar

Title (de)

Rettungskragen

Title (fr)

Collerette de sauvetage

Publication

EP 1069041 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115325 A

Priority

DE 19932386 A

Abstract (en)

The collar has a neck ring (1) with at least one pocket (2',2'',2''') for an inflatable float body . A pressure medium cartridge (5) has a release element (10) and at least one tube (15) connected to the float bodies. At least two float bodies each are arranged in front of and behind the head and are connected to the pockets. The float bodies (3,3') behind the head have a higher drive than the float bodies (4,4') in front of the head.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Rettungskragen, insbesondere zur Rettung einer gefährdeten Person, beispielsweise in Form eines Schwimmkragens oder eines Lawinenrettungsmittels, mit einem Halsring (1) mit mindestens einer Tasche (2,2',2'',2'''), in welcher mindestens ein entfaltbarer und aufblasbarer Tragkörper (3,3';4,4') angeordnet ist und mit einer Druckmittelpatrone (5), welche mit einer Auslöseeinrichtung (10) und mit mindestens einer zu den Tragkörpern führenden Leitung (15) erbunden ist. Erfindungsgemäß finden mindestens zwei gemeinsam aktivierbare, vor und hinter dem Kopf der gefährdeten Person angeordnete, mit den Taschen verbundene Tragkörper (3,4;3',4') Anwendung, wobei der hinter dem Kopf (20) liegende Tragkörper (3 bzw. 3') einen höheren Auftrieb aufweist als der vor dem Kopf (20) befindliche Tragkörper (4,4'). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/15; A62B 33/00; A63B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 33/00 (2006.01); A63B 29/02 (2006.01); B63C 9/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 29/021 (2013.01); A62B 33/00 (2013.01); B63C 9/155 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069041 A2 20010117; EP 1069041 A3 20020213; DE 19932386 A1 20010125; DE 19932386 C2 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI