Global Patent Index - EP 1069043 A2

EP 1069043 A2 2001-01-17 - Ship propulsion with two-motor drive

Title (en)

Ship propulsion with two-motor drive

Title (de)

Schiffsantrieb mit Zweimotoren-Sammelgetriebe

Title (fr)

Propulsion de bateau à deux moteurs

Publication

EP 1069043 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113617 A

Priority

  • DE 19932873 A
  • DE 19954692 A

Abstract (en)

The ship's propulsion drive uses 2 parallel diesel engines (1), each coupled via a switched clutch (3) to a common drive transmission (2), for driving a propeller shaft line (12) for the ship's propeller (5). The engines and the drive transmission are supported separately via elastic engine mountings and elastic drive bearings (13) and drive mountings (14), the drive bearings incorporated in a bearing block attached to the sidewalls (11) of the transmission drive.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schiffsantrieb ist mit einem Zweimotoren-Sammelgetriebe zum Antreiben einer mit einem Propeller (5) versehenen Propellerwellenleitung (12) ausgerüstet, die durch Traglager (4) positioniert ist. Das Getriebe (2) ist starr mit den Antrieben (1) verbunden, weist ein eingebautes Drucklager (23) zur Aufnahme und Übertragung des vom Propeller (5) über die Propellerwellenleitung (12) ausgeübten Schubes auf und ist mit einer Schaltkupplung (3) zum Zu- oder Abschalten der Antriebe (1) verbunden. Die Antriebe (1) sind über elastische Elemente (9), und das Getriebe (2) ist über elastische Auflager (14) und elastische Lagerungen (13) jeweils separat elastisch gelagert. Dabei sind die elastische Lagerungen (13) in einem mit dem Schiffsfundament (6) fest verbundenen separaten Lagerbock (19) integriert und mit an dem Getriebe (2) ausgebildeten Seitenwänden (11) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 23/14; B63H 21/30; B63H 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/12 (2006.01); B63H 21/30 (2006.01); B63H 23/14 (2006.01); F16F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/14 (2013.01); B63H 21/305 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069043 A2 20010117; EP 1069043 A3 20021016; EP 1069043 B1 20040102; JP 2001055195 A 20010227; JP 4689012 B2 20110525; US 6305998 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-01-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111230 AND 20120104

2011-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2011-10-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG#ALFRED-FLENDER-STRASSE 77#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#WITTERLSBACHERPLATZ 2#80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2011-09-07 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110826

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004907 P 20040205

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER AG

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2003-07-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI NL

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: A. FRIEDR. FLENDER GMBH

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI