Global patent index - EP 1069045 A1

EP 1069045 A1 2001-01-17 - Apparatus for supplying adhesive to dispensing heads

Title (en)

Apparatus for supplying adhesive to dispensing heads

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Klebstoff zu Ausgabeköpfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour alimenter en adhésive des têtes de distribution

Publication

EP 1069045 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00114261 A

Priority

IT BO990397 A

Abstract (en)

The adhesive-dispensing heads (5, 5') are fixed on corresponding heated sliders (4, 4') which are mounted with the possibility of adjustment of the distance between them on a straight guide (1) fixed to the means (10) of movement and support of the apparatus, on which are mounted the electrically-operated pneumatic valves (7, 7') which open and close the heads. The channels which supply the adhesive to the heads are connected to channels formed in the sliders and these channels are connected directly or through secondary rotary joints (D2, D2'), which form cylindrical articulations, to two heated and longitudinally hollow arms (16, 16') whose other ends are hinged directly or through further secondary rotary joints to a heated primary rotary joint (D1). This joint is connected to the flexible duct (55) for the supply of the hot-melt adhesive, the terminal portion of this duct being supported by an arm (49) fixed to one end of the primary joint, this arm in turn being supported by suitable means with the possibility of longitudinal movement and rotary movement about a vertical axis. A fork (27) is orientated perpendicularly or orthogonally to the mid-line of the said guide (1), is integral with the latter and interacts with lateral flattened walls (126) of an annular recess (26) of the body of the primary joint (D1), to permit the self-centring adjustment of the distance between the adhesive dispensing heads. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 51/02; B05B 15/08; B31B 1/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/06 (2006.01); B05B 15/08 (2006.01); B31B 1/62 (2006.01); B65B 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/023 (2013.01); B05B 15/065 (2013.01); B05B 15/08 (2013.01); B31B 1/62 (2013.01); B31B 2201/6013 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069045 A1 20010117; IT 1309337 B1 20020122; IT BO990397 A1 20010116; IT BO990397 D0 19990716

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011209

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI