Global Patent Index - EP 1069061 A2

EP 1069061 A2 2001-01-17 - Method and device for cutting a web

Title (en)

Method and device for cutting a web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schneiden einer Bahn

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour couper une bande

Publication

EP 1069061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111977 A

Priority

US 35225399 A

Abstract (en)

The web separation method has the continuous web (6) to be separated transported at a constant rate, with a rotary cutting cylinder (1) rotated at an angular rate which matches the web transport rate during the web separation, the cutting cylinder rotated at an angular rate corresponding to the required length of the cut sections after separation. Also included are Independent claims for the following; (a) a web separation device; (b) a printing machine; (c) a sheet folding device

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Schneiden einer Bahn zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Bahn mit einer im Wesentlichen konstanten Geschwindigkeit bewegt wird, die Bahn in Bahnabschnitte gewünschter Länge geschnitten wird, wobei sich ein Schneidzylinder während des Schneidens der Bahn mit einer Schneid-Winkelgeschwindigkeit dreht, die einer der Geschwindigkeit der Bahn im Wesentlichen angepassten Umfangsgeschwindigkeit des Schneidzylinders entspricht, und dass die Winkelgeschwindigkeit des Schneidzylinders nach dem Schneiden in Abhängigkeit von der gewünschten Länge der Bahnabschnitte geändert wird. Eine Vorrichtung zum Schneiden einer Bahn zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass eine Vorrichtung zum Steuern der Winkelgeschwindigkeit des Schneidzylinders vorgesehen ist, welche den Schneidzylinder während des Schneidens mit einer Schneid-Winkelgeschwindigkeit dreht, die eine der Geschwindigkeit der Bahn im Wesentlichen angepassten Umfangsgeschwindigkeit des Schneidzylinders entspricht, und welche den Schneidzylinder mit einer durchschnittlichen Winkelgeschwindigkeit dreht, die sich von der Schneid-Winkelgeschwindigkeit unterscheidet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/04 (2006.01); B26D 5/20 (2006.01); B65H 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/08 (2013.01); B26D 5/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2513/11 (2013.01); B65H 2513/212 (2013.01); B65H 2513/222 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4656 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4659 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4682 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4737 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069061 A2 20010117; EP 1069061 A3 20020717; DE 10030055 A1 20010125; JP 2001039615 A 20010213; US 6360640 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI