Global patent index - EP 1069067 A1

EP 1069067 A1 2001-01-17 - Swivel ring for lifting loads

Title (en)

Swivel ring for lifting loads

Title (de)

Wirbelöse zum Heben von Lasten

Title (fr)

Anneau articulé pour le levage de charges

Publication

EP 1069067 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99630058 A

Priority

EP 99630058 A

Abstract (en)

The lifting ring has a anchor bolt (13) with a sleeve that is assembled by shrinkage or threading onto the bolt. A plate (16) is arranged at one end, and when assembled this plate is distant from the head of the bolt. A fixture (14) is provided for the ring (11). This is adapted so as to fit over the sleeve and hold the ring so that it can move with respect to the bolt, and hold the ring in place by engaging with the plate and the sleeve.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un anneau articulé pour le levage de charges, en particulier par fixation du ou des anneau(x) sur la charge de sorte que l'axe longitudinal de l'anneau et la direction de levage forment entre elles un angle de 0° à 90°, comprenant une tige de fixation (13) destinée à être assemblée avec une extrémité à une charge à lever par vissage et un anneau (11,12) mobile par rapport à ladite tige (13) à l'autre extrémité de ladite tige (13), ladite tige (13) est un boulon d'ancrage ayant une tête. Une douille (15) est prévue pour être assemblée par frettage ou vissage audit boulon (13) et pourvue d'un flasque (16) à une extrémité, l'extrémité à flasque (16) se trouvant à l'état assemblé éloignée de la tête du boulon d'ancrage (13). Un moyen de fixation (14;31) pour fixer ledit anneau (11,12) est prévu et adapté pour être enfilé sur ladite douille (15) et pour fixer ledit anneau (11,12) de façon mobile audit boulon (13) et le maintenir en place en coopération avec ledit flasque (16) de ladite douille (15) . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/66 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32213 (2013.01); Y10T 403/32975 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069067 A1 20010117; EP 1069067 B1 20050928; AT 305435 T 20051015; DE 69927493 D1 20051103; DE 69927493 T2 20060622; ES 2249877 T3 20060401; US 6293600 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-06-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-04-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

2013-03-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20130218

2011-09-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: OFFICE FREYLINGER S.A., LU

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-09-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110906

2011-07-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INTELPROP S.A., LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20110512

2011-07-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110704 AND 20110706

2011-06-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060709

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.H.B.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2249877

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-12-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-11-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69927493

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-11-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030102

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000201

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI