Global Patent Index - EP 1069068 A1

EP 1069068 A1 2001-01-17 - Compact drive for an elevator

Title (en)

Compact drive for an elevator

Title (de)

Kompakter Antrieb für einen Aufzug

Title (fr)

Entraînement compact pour un ascenseur

Publication

EP 1069068 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114770 A

Priority

  • EP 00114770 A
  • EP 99810639 A

Abstract (en)

The elevator drive unit has an electric drive (6) provided with a motor housing (15) enclosing a drive motor (16) with a rotor (18) and stator (17) and a drive disc (7) coupled to the rotor, provided with an integrated braking device (26,27) for blocking its rotation. The drive disc is provided as a hollow cylinder enclosing the braking device, with ridges (25) in its outer mantle surface for the elevator cable, the inner mantle surface acting as a brake drum. An Independent claim for a frame-less elevator provided with a compact drive unit is also included.

Abstract (de)

Diese Antriebseinheit besteht aus Antrieb (6) und Treibscheibe (7), wobei der Antrieb (6) ein Gehäuse (15) und einen Motor (16) mit Stator (17) und Rotor aufweist. Eine am Gehäuse (15) gelagerte Welle (19) überträgt die Rotationsbewegung des Rotors (18) auf die Treibscheibe (7). Am motorseitigen Wellenende ist ein Impulsgenerator (22) angeordnet, der die Rotationsbewegung der Welle (19) misst. Am anderen Wellenende ist ein Wellenflansch (23) angeordnet, an dem die Treibscheibe (7) befestigbar ist. Die Treibscheibe (7) ist als einseitig geschlossener Hohlzylinder ausgebildet. An der Mantelaussenfläche der Treibscheibe (7) sind Seilrillen (25) angeordnet, die der Führung der Tragseile (8) und der Kraftübertragung von der Treibscheibe (7) auf die Tragseile (8) dienen. Die Mantelinnenfläche der Treibscheibe (7) ist als Bremstrommel (26) ausgebildet, an der betätigbare Bremsbacken (27) den Antrieb (6) stillsetzen. An den Bremsbacken (27) greifen Bremshebel (28) an, die mittels ersten Betätigungsbolzen (29) von Aktuatoren (30) betätigbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 5/08; B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/04 (2006.01); B66D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 5/08 (2013.01); B66B 11/0438 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069068 A1 20010117; EP 1069068 B1 20060607

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090710

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012889 P 20060720

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040108

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI