Global Patent Index - EP 1069077 A1

EP 1069077 A1 2001-01-17 - Device for treating water

Title (en)

Device for treating water

Title (de)

Wasseraufbereitungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement de l'eau

Publication

EP 1069077 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104783 A

Priority

DE 19933204 A

Abstract (en)

Multi-stage treatment process for drinking water to enhance its potable qualities, is carried out within an assembly having an inlet and outlet for water. A supply of drinking water is subjected to a multi-stage treatment process which enhances its potable qualities. The process is carried out within an assembly which has an upright housing (10) with an inlet (12) for untreated water and an outlet for treated water. The chamber within the mantle is sub-divided into compartments (16-22) by upright separation panels (18). Each compartment is linked to the previous and next compartment either at base or top, forming a tubular system, with water cascading through each compartment in succession. After flowing through the last compartment (22), the water is discharged through an outlet (14). Each compartment (16-22) contains materials which treat the water as required e.g. active carbon, zeolite, marble, dolomite, magnesite.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Wasseraufbereitungsvorrichtung, welche in einer Wasserleitung einfügbar oder an einer Wasserzapfstelle anschließbar ist. Die Wasseraufbereitungsvorrichtung besteht aus einem Gehäuse mit darin integrierten Behandlungsstufen, aus einer Einlaßvorrichtung für das unbehandelte Wasser und einer Auslaßvorrichtung für das behandelte Wasser. Erfindungsgemäß sind die Behandlungsstufen durch senkrecht im Gehäuse verlaufende Wände räumlich voneinander getrennt, wobei die Räume im unteren und oberen Bereich des Gehäuses so miteinander verbunden sind, daß sich ein röhrenartiges System bildet. Das durch die Einlaßvorrichtung strömende Wasser durchströmt alle Räume nacheinander und verläßt den letzten Raum durch die Auslaßvorrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C02F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/00 (2006.01); C02F 1/28 (2006.01); C02F 1/48 (2006.01); C02F 1/50 (2006.01); C02F 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C02F 1/003 (2013.01); C02F 1/28 (2013.01); C02F 1/281 (2013.01); C02F 1/283 (2013.01); C02F 1/48 (2013.01); C02F 1/505 (2013.01); C02F 1/68 (2013.01); C02F 2201/006 (2013.01); C02F 2307/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069077 A1 20010117; DE 19933204 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031218

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI