Global Patent Index - EP 1069096 A1

EP 1069096 A1 2001-01-17 - Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (en)

Non-azide gas generating composition

Title (de)

Azidfreie gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition génératrice de gaz exempt d'azoture

Publication

EP 1069096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113004 A

Priority

DE 19932466 A

Abstract (en)

Brown, ferromagnetic gamma -iron oxide ( gamma -Fe2O3) is used in an azide-free gas generating composition for car passenger restraint systems containing: (a) organic fuel(s); (b) inorganic oxidizing agent(s); and (c) iron oxide.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine azidfreie gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung zur Verwendung in Gasgeneratoren für Fahrzeuginsassen-Rückhaltesysteme, im wesentlichen bestehend aus wenigstens einem organischen Brennstoff, wenigstens einem anorganischen Oxidator und Eisenoxid (-Fe2O3;Maghämit).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06; C06B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 23/02 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06B 23/02 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1069096 A1 20010117; EP 1069096 B1 20050511; DE 19932466 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070621

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010265

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2005-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW AIRBAG SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG